House
|
04/24/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Public Act 13-4
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 5824
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 5832
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 344
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
File Number 237
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
House Calendar Number 180
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/19
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|