House | 06/04/2013 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/24/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 648 | ||
House | 05/24/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | File Number 672 | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | House Calendar Number 465 | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Public Hearing 04/01 | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |