House | 04/23/2013 | File Number 594 | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | House Calendar Number 406 | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Public Hearing 03/25 | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |