Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
Public Act 13-210
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
File Number 888
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 678
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 6555
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8221
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
File Number 637
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
House Calendar Number 425
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/25
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|