House | 04/10/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Public Hearing 03/25 | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |