House | 07/12/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/27/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/27/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/21/2013 | Public Act 13-300 | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 606 | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | File Number 730 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | House Calendar Number 509 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Public Hearing 04/05 | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |