House | 05/14/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | File Number 695 | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | House Calendar Number 478 | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Public Hearing 04/01 | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |