House | 05/21/2013 | Motion Failed JF | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | File Number 733 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | House Calendar Number 512 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Public Hearing 04/01 | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |