House
|
05/27/2013
|
File Number 865
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 658
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7644
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7618
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
File Number 734
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
House Calendar Number 513
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Public Hearing 04/05
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|