Senate
|
07/12/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
Special Act 13-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 710
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8725
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
File Number 736
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
House Calendar Number 515
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Public Hearing 04/05
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|