House | 06/25/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/14/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/13/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/11/2013 | Public Act 13-213 | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 607 | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | File Number 675 | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | House Calendar Number 468 | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Public Hearing 04/05 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |