House | 05/20/2013 | File Number 836 | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 628 | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7087 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | File Number 739 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | House Calendar Number 518 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Public Hearing 04/15 | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |