House | 06/01/2013 | House Re-adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7956 | ||
House | 06/01/2013 | House Reconsidered House Amendment Schedule A 7956 | ||
House | 06/01/2013 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
House | 05/31/2013 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7956 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | File Number 741 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | House Calendar Number 520 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Public Hearing 04/15 | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |