Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
Public Act 13-184
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 8708
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 8690
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 8683
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 8679
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8654
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8651
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8609
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule G 8576
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 8599
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 8595
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 8596
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 8577
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 8594
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8471
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Emergency Certification
|
|
|