Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Commerce | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | File Number 381 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 274 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Vote to Draft |