Senate | 04/12/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | File Number 96 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 133 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/18/2013 | Vote to Draft |