LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00024
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00024
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2013 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00024
Action History
Senate
03/13/2013
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
Senate
03/12/2013
Drafted by Committee
Senate
02/21/2013
Vote to Draft
Senate
02/08/2013
Public Hearing 02/19
Senate
02/01/2013
Change of Reference Housing
Senate
01/25/2013
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing