Senate | 05/08/2013 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | File Number 309 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 234 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |