Senate | 05/28/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Public Act 13-18 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | House Calendar Number 369 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | File Number 103 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 151 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2013 | Vote to Draft |