Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Public Act 13-48
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
House Calendar Number 435
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
File Number 241
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 211
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|