Senate | 06/05/2013 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | House Calendar Number 564 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | No New File by Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5894 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | File Number 104 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 139 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |