Senate | 05/15/2013 | House Calendar Number 565 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6717 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | File Number 330 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 261 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |