Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Public Act 13-237
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Calendar Number 695
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8854
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
File Number 311
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 239
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/20
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|