Senate | 05/31/2013 | House Calendar Number 663 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | File Number 331 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 265 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |