Senate | 05/09/2013 | House Calendar Number 541 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | File Number 140 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 155 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |