Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Public Act 13-17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
House Calendar Number 485
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6010
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
File Number 254
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 230
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/13
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|