Senate | 05/15/2013 | House Calendar Number 566 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | File Number 244 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 207 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |