Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | File Number 645 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 473 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |