Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Public Act 13-124
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
File Number 850
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7535
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
House Calendar Number 373
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
File Number 45
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 100
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/14
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|