Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Recommitted to General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
File Number 432
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 296
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2013
|
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2013
|
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Change of Reference Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|