Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Veterans' Affairs | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | File Number 332 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 266 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |