Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
Public Act 13-241
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,C
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,C
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House Calendar Number 623
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,C
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 7483
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7473
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7420
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
File Number 146
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 164
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|