Senate | 05/09/2013 | House Calendar Number 543 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | File Number 433 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 313 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |