Senate | 05/01/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | File Number 181 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 194 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2013 | Vote to Draft |