Senate
|
06/21/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Public Act 13-224
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House Calendar Number 596
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
File Number 557
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 407
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|