House
|
07/12/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Public Act 13-304
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8948
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House Calendar Number 546
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
File Number 477
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 360
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2013
|
Public Hearing 01/28
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|