Senate | 06/04/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | File Number 58 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 122 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Public Hearing 01/28 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |