Senate | 06/03/2013 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | File Number 98 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 135 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Public Hearing 01/28 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |