Senate | 03/11/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Public Hearing 02/05 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |