Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Public Act 13-70
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House Calendar Number 571
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5642
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
File Number 18
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 48
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/05
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|