Senate | 02/19/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Public Hearing 02/05 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |