Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Special Act 13-6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
House Calendar Number 374
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
File Number 46
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 110
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/05
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|