Senate | 03/28/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |