Senate | 05/30/2013 | House Calendar Number 660 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 7413 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 5878 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 7415 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8064 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8063 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | File Number 3 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 38 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/21/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 01/25/2013 | Public Hearing 01/31 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |