Senate | 05/28/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Public Act 13-19 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 6978 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | House Calendar Number 486 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | File Number 384 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 277 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |