Senate | 05/09/2013 | File Number 782 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | File Number 559 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 409 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |