Senate
|
06/21/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
Public Act 13-185
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House Calendar Number 648
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7651
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
File Number 434
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 307
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|