Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00650 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Committee Bill No. 650
22 January Session, 2013 LCO No. 4229
3- *_____SB00650KIDAPP031213____*
3+ *04229SB00650KID*
44 Referred to Committee on CHILDREN
55 Introduced by:
66 (KID)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Committee Bill No. 650
1111
1212 January Session, 2013
1313
1414 LCO No. 4229
1515
16-*_____SB00650KIDAPP031213____*
16+*04229SB00650KID*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on CHILDREN
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (KID)
2323
2424 AN ACT CREATING A PARENTS' SUPPORT HOT LINE FOR PARENTS OF CHILDREN EXHIBITING MENTAL OR BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ISSUES.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2013) The Commissioner of Children and Families shall, within available appropriations, provide a telephone hotline for any parent or guardian of a child exhibiting signs of mental or behavioral health issues to access for information and assistance. Such hotline shall: (1) Accept all reports of mental or behavioral health issues regarding children within the state; (2) provide emergency services, including, but not limited to, mobile response, psychiatric assessment, medical consultation and substance abuse screening; (3) provide crisis response and crisis stabilization services; and (4) provide counseling and referral services to any parent, guardian or immediate family member of a child exhibiting signs of mental or behavioral health issues. For purposes of this section, "immediate family member" means any person related by blood, adoption or marriage to a child.
2929
3030 Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2013) (a) Not later than October 1, 2014, the Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services shall identify a college or university within the state that conducts mental and behavioral health research. Not later than January 1, 2015, the department shall, in conjunction with such college or university, and within available appropriations, develop and implement a pilot program to explore and address the mental and behavioral health of children in the state. Such pilot program shall: (1) Educate parents and guardians on the warning signs associated with mental or behavioral health issues; (2) provide counseling and resources for any children exhibiting signs of mental and behavioral health issues; and (3) establish a community outreach initiative to raise awareness of mental or behavioral health issues within the state.
3131
3232 (b) Not later than January 1, 2016, the department shall report, in accordance with section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to children, with respect to the status and effectiveness of the pilot program established pursuant to subsection (a) of this section.
3333
3434 (c) The pilot program shall terminate on January 1, 2016.
3535
3636
3737
3838
3939 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4040 Section 1 October 1, 2013 New section
4141 Sec. 2 July 1, 2013 New section
4242
4343 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4444
4545 Section 1
4646
4747 October 1, 2013
4848
4949 New section
5050
5151 Sec. 2
5252
5353 July 1, 2013
5454
5555 New section
5656
57+Statement of Purpose:
58+
59+To develop a one-stop support mechanism for parents whose children are exhibiting behavioral health issues.
60+
61+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]
5762
5863
59-KID Joint Favorable C/R APP
6064
61-KID
65+Co-Sponsors: SEN. HARP, 10th Dist.; REP. WALKER, 93rd Dist.
6266
63-Joint Favorable C/R
67+Co-Sponsors:
6468
65-APP
69+SEN. HARP, 10th Dist.; REP. WALKER, 93rd Dist.
70+
71+S.B. 650