Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Children | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | File Number 245 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 203 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |