Senate | 03/08/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Vote to Draft |